E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1726
|
Journal Page: 6709
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6706
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2689
|
Journal Page: 6705
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1252
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4341
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4341
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4341
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6139
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1566
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5761
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|