House | 05/03/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1086 | Journal Page: 2696 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Postponed | 5/3/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2212 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2212 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Postponed | 4/26/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1988 |
House | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1988 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 761 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 761 | |
House | 03/04/2011 | Filed |