E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6232
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1621
|
Journal Page: 6232
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6232
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5760
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|