House | 05/10/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3399 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 551 | Journal Page: 3399 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/10/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3067 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3067 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Postponed | 5/5/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2365 |
House | 04/28/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Postponed | 4/28/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2155 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Postponed | 4/21/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1807 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1807 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Postponed | 4/14/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1589 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 354 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 354 | |
House | 11/09/2010 | Filed |