Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2351 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: McClendon (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 2351
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Bexar County Hospital District to
 employ physicians.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 281, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 281.0283 to read as follows:
 Sec. 281.0283.  BEXAR COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT; EMPLOYMENT
 OF PHYSICIANS.  (a)  The board of the Bexar County Hospital
 District may employ physicians as the board considers necessary for
 the efficient operation of the district.
 (b)  A physician employed by the Bexar County Hospital
 District under this section must practice with a nonprofit health
 organization certified by the Texas Medical Board and created by
 the Bexar County Hospital District.
 (c)  The term of an employment contract entered into under
 this section may not exceed four years.
 (d)  This section may not be construed as authorizing the
 board of the Bexar County Hospital District to supervise or control
 the practice of medicine, as prohibited by Subtitle B, Title 3,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *