Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2055 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#751 | Journal Page: 2972 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2972 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2972 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2893 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Amended | 1-Gallego | Journal Page: 2893 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2893 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2390 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Filed |