House | 05/03/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2724 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 257 | Journal Page: 2709 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2709 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2709 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 923 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 11/10/2010 | Filed |