E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1700
|
Journal Page: 6589
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6588
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4613
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4012
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4012
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5785
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5785
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5785
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1101
|
Journal Page: 3958
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3958
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3958
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 3708
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3708
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2933
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|