1 | 1 | | By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2387 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2011, rereferred to Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | on International Relations and Trade; May 21, 2011, reported |
---|
6 | 6 | | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent |
---|
7 | 7 | | to printer.) |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the selection, compensation, and duties of the general |
---|
13 | 13 | | counsel to an appraisal district. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 6.05, Tax Code, is amended by amending |
---|
16 | 16 | | Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (j) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (d) The chief appraiser is entitled to compensation as |
---|
18 | 18 | | provided by the budget adopted by the board of directors. The chief |
---|
19 | 19 | | appraiser's compensation may not be directly or indirectly linked |
---|
20 | 20 | | to an increase in the total market, appraised, or taxable value of |
---|
21 | 21 | | property in the appraisal district. The chief appraiser may employ |
---|
22 | 22 | | and compensate professional, clerical, and other personnel as |
---|
23 | 23 | | provided by the budget, with the exception of a general counsel to |
---|
24 | 24 | | the appraisal district. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (j) The board of directors of an appraisal district may |
---|
26 | 26 | | employ a general counsel to the district to serve at the will of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | board. The general counsel shall provide counsel directly to the |
---|
28 | 28 | | board and perform other duties and responsibilities as determined |
---|
29 | 29 | | by the board. The general counsel is entitled to compensation as |
---|
30 | 30 | | provided by the budget adopted by the board. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
32 | 32 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
33 | 33 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
34 | 34 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
35 | 35 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
36 | 36 | | * * * * * |
---|