E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5553
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5553
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1463
|
Journal Page: 5553
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5553
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2927
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2927
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|