House | 05/05/2011 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3062 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/5/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2858 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2858 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Postponed | 5/4/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2755 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Filed |