E | 05/31/2011 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3966 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2296 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1385 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2286 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Record vote | RV#559 | Journal Page: 2285 |
House | 04/27/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2244 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#536 | Journal Page: 2243 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 766 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Filed |