|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1461
|
Journal Page: 5532
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
|
05/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1074
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 766
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 766
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|