E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6848
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1731
|
Journal Page: 6847
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6840
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 6847
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5052
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4647
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6272
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6272
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6272
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Williams
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3722
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3530
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3530
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1020
|
Journal Page: 3704
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3704
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3704
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3638
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
House
|
11/10/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|