E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3374
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3374
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3374
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3373
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|