Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#318
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1606
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1606
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#300
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
House
|
11/10/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|