House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6873
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1255
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5889
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5889
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5889
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#902
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|