E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5753
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Open Government, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1004
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3689
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|