E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6455
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6874
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1496
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5387
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 782
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 782
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|