Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2472 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Marquez (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 2472
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of certain warrant or capias information
 to the national crime information center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 2.195, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 2.195.  [DUTY TO] REPORT OF WARRANT OR CAPIAS
 INFORMATION. Not later than the 30th day after [Within 30 days of]
 the date [day] the court clerk issues the warrant or capias, the
 sheriff:
 (1)  shall report to the national crime information
 center each warrant or capias issued for a defendant charged with a
 felony who fails to appear in court when summoned; and
 (2)  may [shall] report to the national crime
 information center each warrant or capias issued for a defendant
 charged with a misdemeanor [an offense] other than a Class C
 misdemeanor who fails to appear in court when summoned.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a warrant or capias issued on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A warrant or capias issued before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the warrant or
 capias was issued, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *