E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6870
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6393
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6394
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1656
|
Journal Page: 6394
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6389
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4389
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5580
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5580
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5580
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#630
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|