House | 05/03/2011 | Postponed | 7/4/11 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 2707 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2693 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Record vote | RV#617 | Journal Page: 2567 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2567 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Amendment tabled | 1-Turner | Journal Page: 2566 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2566 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Postponed | 5/2/11 7:59 AM | Journal Page: 2365 |
House | 04/28/2011 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2365 |
House | 04/28/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Postponed | 4/28/11 9:59 AM | Journal Page: 2231 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2231 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |