House | 04/27/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |