House | 04/28/2011 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |