E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5251
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5251
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1379
|
Journal Page: 5251
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5251
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1064
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3734
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|