Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2541 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Solomons (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2541
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of traffic on certain roads by counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 542, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 542.0081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 542.0081.  TRAFFIC REGULATIONS: SPECIAL DISTRICT IN
 CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) This section applies only to a road owned or
 maintained by a special district that is located in the
 unincorporated area of a county with a population of less than one
 million.
 (b)  The residents of all or any portion of a special
 district may file a petition with the commissioners court of the
 county in which the roads are located requesting that county
 enforcement of traffic rules on county roads be extended to the
 roads of the district. The petition must:
 (1)  specify the roads over which county enforcement is
 sought;
 (2)  specify the traffic rules for which county
 enforcement is sought; and
 (3)  be signed by 50 percent of the property owners
 residing in the area that is served by the roads of the district
 over which county enforcement is sought.
 (c)  If the commissioners court finds that granting the
 request is in the interest of the county generally, the
 commissioners court shall by order extend the enforcement of
 traffic rules by the county to the roads of the district specified
 in the petition. The order may grant enforcement of some or all
 traffic rules requested in the petition.
 (d)  As a condition of extending a traffic rule under
 Subsection (c), the commissioners court may require the special
 district to pay for all or a part of the costs of extending
 enforcement to the roads of the district. The commissioners court
 shall consult with the sheriff to determine the cost of extending
 enforcement.
 (e)  On issuance of an order under this section, the roads
 specified in the order are considered to be county roads for the
 purposes of the application and enforcement of the specified
 traffic rules. The commissioners court may place official traffic
 control devices on the right-of-way of the roads of the district if
 those devices relate to the specified traffic rules.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *