E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6267
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1628
|
Journal Page: 6267
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6267
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6267
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4340
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4340
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4340
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6080
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6080
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6080
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5754
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2933
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2933
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|