House | 05/11/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1087 | Journal Page: 3606 |
House | 05/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |