E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6298
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1634
|
Journal Page: 6298
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6297
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4384
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5585
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5585
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5585
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2975
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2319
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1080
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3803
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3803
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 829
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|