Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2561 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eissler (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2561
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 27, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of "school year" for purposes of the
 Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 821.001(15), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (15)  "School year" means[:
 [(A)] a 12-month period beginning [approximately]
 September 1 and ending [approximately] August 31 of the next
 calendar year[; or
 [(B) for a member whose contract or oral or
 written work agreement begins after June 30 and continues after
 August 31 of the same calendar year, a period not to include more
 than 12 months beginning on the date the contract or agreement
 begins].
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2012-2013
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *