E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5754
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2933
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2933
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|