Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3680 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#995 | Journal Page: 3680 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3680 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Pea | Journal Page: 3680 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3680 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 11:50 AM | Journal Page: 3674 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Pea | Journal Page: 3674 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3674 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3561 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amended | 1-Pena | Journal Page: 3561 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3561 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/10/11 9:15 PM | Journal Page: 3405 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 18(b) | Journal Page: 3405 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |