E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1678
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6473
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2648
|
Journal Page: 6472
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6870
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1248
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4610
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5555
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#438
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/19/11 9:50 AM
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
12-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
14-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
12-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1891
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1891
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#418
|
Journal Page: 1890
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
11-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
9-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
9-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1888
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1882
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|