E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1719
|
Journal Page: 6687
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6668
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2686
|
Journal Page: 6667
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6870
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4149
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#631
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Garza
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#618
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|