1 | 1 | | By: Veasey (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 2615 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Commerce; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | 5 | | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the provision of information on financial literacy |
---|
11 | 11 | | resources to the public. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 14, Finance Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 14.1025 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 14.1025. FINANCIAL LITERACY PROGRAM INFORMATION. (a) |
---|
16 | 16 | | In this section: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Financial literacy" means proficiency at |
---|
18 | 18 | | managing personal finances. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Health and human services agencies" has the |
---|
20 | 20 | | meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The commissioner shall collect information on programs, |
---|
22 | 22 | | including classes, and other resources available to the public that |
---|
23 | 23 | | focus on teaching financial literacy, compile the information into |
---|
24 | 24 | | a one-page document, and post the document on the office's Internet |
---|
25 | 25 | | website. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) A health and human services agency shall ensure that the |
---|
27 | 27 | | document under Subsection (b) is offered to persons who receive |
---|
28 | 28 | | services from the agency at locations at which those persons |
---|
29 | 29 | | frequently access services provided by the agency. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (d) The commissioner shall periodically update the |
---|
31 | 31 | | information contained in the document described by Subsection (b). |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. The Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner shall |
---|
33 | 33 | | produce and publish on the office's Internet website the document |
---|
34 | 34 | | required by Section 14.1025, Finance Code, as added by this Act, not |
---|
35 | 35 | | later than December 1, 2011. |
---|
36 | 36 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
37 | 37 | | * * * * * |
---|