House
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB983
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 802
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 802
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|