82R13011 TJS-D By: Kolkhorst H.B. No. 2618 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to Walker County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Not later than January 31, 2012, the Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall donate and transfer to Walker County the real property described by Subsection (e) of this section. (b) Walker County shall use the property transferred under this Act only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state by memorializing veterans with a museum and related static displays. If Walker County uses the property for any purpose other than a purpose described by this subsection, ownership of the property automatically reverts to the Texas Board of Criminal Justice. (c) The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall transfer the property by an appropriate instrument of transfer. The instrument of transfer must: (1) provide that: (A) Walker County shall use the property only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state by memorializing veterans with a museum and related static displays; and (B) ownership of the property will automatically revert to the Texas Board of Criminal Justice if Walker County uses the property for any purpose other than a purpose described by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision; and (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes and bounds. (d) The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall retain custody of the instrument of transfer after the instrument of transfer is filed in the real property records of Walker County. (e) The real property referred to in this section is described as follows: Being 5.57 acres of land, situated in the City of Huntsville, PLEASANT GRAY LEAGUE, Abstract No. 24, Walker County, Texas, and being out of and a part of the residue of a called 515 acre tract described in a Deed from Ed H. Cunningham and L.A. Ellis to the Governor of the State of Texas dated July 10, 1883 and recorded in Volume Y, page 181, Deed Records of Walker County, Texas said 5.57 acres being more definitely described by metes and bounds as follows: BEGINNING for reference only, at the northeast corner of a called 10.01 acre tract out of said 515 acres as described in a Deed from the State of Texas to Walker County dated February 3, 2000 and recorded in Volume 417, page 218, Official Public Records, said corner being in a south line of a called 3.78 acre tract described in a Deed from Texas Department of Corrections to the State of Texas (for additional State Highway No. 75 Right-of-Way) dated November 14, 1967 and recorded in Volume 209, page 707, Deed Records, at a 5/8" iron rod with plastic cap having coordinates of N=10,263,443.31 feet and E=3,788,337.42 feet for corner in the south right-of-way line of State Highway No. 75; THENCE, S 29°55'00"W with the east line of said Walker County, 10.01 acre tract, a distance of 408.18 feet to the Beginning Point for the said 5.57 acre herein described; said beginning point being common with southwest corner of the Walker County 5.0 acre tract described in a deed from Texas Board of Criminal Justice in volume 595, page 210 of the Walker County Official Records; THENCE, S 83°08'57"E for a distance of 438.01 feet with the southerly property line of the above mentioned Walker County 5.0 acre tract of land to a point in the said property line, set an iron rod; THENCE, S29°55'00"W for a distance of 707.49 feet across the Texas Board of Criminal Justice property to a point marked with an iron rod in the easterly Right-of-Way line of I-45 and common with the property line of the Texas Board of Criminal Justice property as created by the Texas Department of Transportation right-of-way obtained across the property described in Volume Y, Page 181, Walker County, Texas Official Deed Records; THENCE, N55°07'42"W for a distance of 355.78 feet to a point in the I-45 Right-of-Way line designated as a point of Right-of-Way widening for future construction by Texas Department of Transportation described in a document from State of Texas Board of Criminal Justice to Walker County, Texas, recorded in Volume 412, Page 149 of the Official Public Records of Walker County, Texas, set an iron rod; THENCE, N34°50'47"E for a distance of 20.28 feet to a ell corner point of the 5.57 acre tract herein described in the said Right-of-Way widening for future construction, set an iron rod; THENCE, N55°02'52"W for a distance of 50.07 feet to a point, found iron rod, where the said Rights-of-Way widening line intersects with the easterly property line of the previously described 10.01 acre Walker County tract, and a common line of the herein described 5.57 acre tract; THENCE, N29°45'46"E with the East line of the said 10.01 acre Walker County tract for a distance of 150.55 feet to a point marked with an iron rod. THENCE, N29°55'00"E for a distance of 330.00 feet to the POINT OF BEGINNING and containing 5.57 acres of land. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.