Senate | 05/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2506 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1386 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Record vote | RV#562 | Journal Page: 2287 |
House | 04/27/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2287 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2287 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 802 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 802 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |