Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2624 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 2624
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures applicable in circumstances involving
 family violence or other criminal conduct and military personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 85.042, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsections (c) and (d) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  This subsection applies only if the respondent, at the
 time of issuance of an original or modified protective order under
 this subtitle, is a member of the state military forces or is
 serving in the armed forces of the United States in an active-duty
 status. In addition to complying with Subsection (a), the clerk of
 the court shall also provide a copy of the protective order and the
 information described by that subsection to the staff judge
 advocate at Joint Force Headquarters or the provost marshal of the
 military installation to which the respondent is assigned with the
 intent that the commanding officer will be notified, as applicable.
 (c)  The clerk of a court that vacates an original or
 modified protective order under this subtitle shall notify each
 individual or entity [the chief of police or constable and sheriff]
 who received a copy of the original or modified order from the clerk
 under this section that the order is vacated.
 (d)  The applicant or the applicant's attorney shall provide
 to the clerk of the court:
 (1)  the name and address of each law enforcement
 agency, child-care facility, [and] school, and other individual or
 entity to which the clerk is required to mail a copy of the order
 under this section; and
 (2)  any other information required under Section
 411.042(b)(6), Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Article 5.05, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A peace officer who investigates a family violence
 incident or who responds to a disturbance call that may involve
 family violence shall make a written report, including but not
 limited to:
 (1)  the names of the suspect and complainant;
 (2)  the date, time, and location of the incident;
 (3)  any visible or reported injuries; [and]
 (4)  a description of the incident and a statement of
 its disposition; and
 (5)  whether the suspect is a member of the state
 military forces or is serving in the armed forces of the United
 States in an active-duty status.
 (a-2)  If a suspect is identified as being a member of the
 military, as described by Subsection (a)(5), the peace officer
 shall provide written notice of the incident or disturbance call to
 the staff judge advocate at Joint Force Headquarters or the provost
 marshal of the military installation to which the suspect is
 assigned with the intent that the commanding officer will be
 notified, as applicable.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 42, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 42.0182 to read as follows:
 Art. 42.0182.  NOTICE OF FAMILY VIOLENCE OFFENSES PROVIDED
 BY CLERK OF COURT. (a)  This article applies only:
 (1)  to conviction or deferred adjudication granted on
 the basis of:
 (A)  an offense that constitutes family violence,
 as defined by Section 71.004, Family Code; or
 (B)  an offense under Title 5, Penal Code; and
 (2)  if the defendant is a member of the state military
 forces or is serving in the armed forces of the United States in an
 active-duty status.
 (b)  As soon as possible after the date on which the
 defendant is convicted or granted deferred adjudication on the
 basis of an offense, the clerk of the court in which the conviction
 or deferred adjudication is entered shall provide written notice of
 the conviction or deferred adjudication to the staff judge advocate
 at Joint Force Headquarters or the provost marshal of the military
 installation to which the defendant is assigned with the intent
 that the commanding officer will be notified, as applicable.
 SECTION 4.  Section 9, Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  Each presentence investigation shall include
 information regarding whether the defendant is a current or former
 member of the state military forces or whether the defendant is
 currently serving or has previously served in the armed forces of
 the United States in an active-duty status. If the defendant has
 served in an active-duty status, the investigation shall
 additionally determine whether the defendant was deployed to a
 combat zone and whether the defendant may suffer from
 post-traumatic stress disorder or a traumatic brain injury. In
 addition, if available, a copy of the defendant's military
 discharge papers and military records must be included in the
 investigation report provided to the judge under Subsection (a) of
 this section.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *