House
|
05/03/2011
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB1269
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|