House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 815 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 815 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |