Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB265 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hilderbran (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 265
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the lease of space by or for a state agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2167.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2167.002.  PREREQUISITES FOR LEASING SPACE. (a)  The
 commission may lease space for a state agency in accordance with
 this chapter and the agency's specifications if:
 (1)  state-owned space is not otherwise available to
 the agency; and
 (2)  the agency has verified it has money available to
 pay for the lease.
 (b)  In making a determination under this section that
 state-owned space is not available to a state agency, the
 commission must consider all reasonably available state-owned
 space in this state, regardless of whether utilizing state-owned
 space would require the agency to move all or part of the agency's
 operations to a different geographic location in this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2167.005(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may delegate to a state agency, including
 an institution of higher education, the authority to enter into
 lease contracts for space if the commission determines that
 state-owned space is not available as provided by Section 2167.002.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *