House | 04/26/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 816 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 816 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |