Senate | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2199 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3830 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3323 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | RV#893 | Journal Page: 3323 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3323 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Amended | 1-Menendez and J. Davis | Journal Page: 3322 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3322 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Amended | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 3239 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3239 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 816 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 816 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |