E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3337
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1315
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4927
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#472
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1978
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1978
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|