House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 818 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 818 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |