Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2319
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1044
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3837
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3837
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|