E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6358
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1641
|
Journal Page: 6357
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6331
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2572
|
Journal Page: 6330
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 4540
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4540
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1212
|
Journal Page: 4540
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4014
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4102
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4102
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4102
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3827
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2252
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#469
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#457
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
43-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
40-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
42-Turner
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
40-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
39-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
Amendment No. 36
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
32-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
18-Castro
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
18-Castro
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
17-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
5-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
6-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|