Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2699 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for an insurance adjuster license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4101.001(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In this chapter:
 (1)  "Adjuster" [, "adjuster"] means a person [an
 individual] who:
 (A) [(1)] investigates or adjusts losses on
 behalf of an insurer as an independent contractor or as an employee
 of:
 (i) [(A)]  an adjustment bureau;
 (ii) [(B)]  an association;
 (iii) [(C)]  a general property and casualty
 agent or personal lines property and casualty agent;
 (iv) [(D)]  an independent contractor;
 (v) [(E)]  an insurer; or
 (vi) [(F)]  a managing general agent;
 (B) [(2)]  supervises the handling of claims; or
 (C) [(3)]  investigates, adjusts, supervises the
 handling of, or settles workers' compensation claims, including
 claims arising from services provided through a certified workers'
 compensation health care network as authorized under Chapter 1305,
 on behalf of an administrator, as defined by Chapter 4151, or on
 behalf of an insurance carrier, as defined by Section 401.011,
 Labor Code.
 (2)  "Automated claims adjudication system" means a
 computer program designed for the collection, data entry,
 calculation, and final resolution of portable consumer electronic
 insurance claims that a licensed independent adjuster, a licensed
 agent, an officer of a business entity licensed under this chapter,
 or a supervised individual uses as described by this chapter.
 (3)  "Business entity" means a corporation,
 association, partnership, limited liability company, limited
 liability partnership, or other legal entity.
 (4)  "Home state," with respect to an adjuster, means:
 (A)  the state in which the adjuster maintains the
 adjuster's principal place of residence or business and is licensed
 to act as a resident adjuster; or
 (B)  if the state of the adjuster's principal
 place of residence or business does not license adjusters for the
 line of authority sought, a state in which the adjuster is licensed
 and in good standing and that is designated by the adjuster as the
 adjuster's home state.
 (5)  "Person" means an individual or business entity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4101.002, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  an attorney who:
 (A)  adjusts insurance losses periodically and
 incidentally to the practice of law; and
 (B)  does not represent that the attorney is an
 adjuster;
 (2)  a salaried employee of an insurer who is not
 regularly engaged in the adjustment, investigation, or supervision
 of insurance claims;
 (3)  a person employed only to furnish technical
 assistance to a licensed adjuster, including:
 (A)  an attorney;
 (B)  an engineer;
 (C)  an estimator;
 (D)  a handwriting expert;
 (E)  a photographer; and
 (F)  a private detective;
 (4)  an agent or general agent of an authorized insurer
 who processes an undisputed or uncontested loss for the insurer
 under a policy issued by the agent or general agent;
 (5)  a person who performs clerical duties and does not
 negotiate with parties to disputed or contested claims;
 (6)  a person who handles claims arising under life,
 accident, and health insurance policies;
 (7)  a person:
 (A)  who is employed principally as:
 (i)  a right-of-way agent; or
 (ii)  a right-of-way and claims agent;
 (B)  whose primary responsibility is the
 acquisition of easements, leases, permits, or other real property
 rights; and
 (C)  who handles only claims arising out of
 operations under those easements, leases, permits, or other
 contracts or contractual obligations;
 (8)  an individual who is employed to investigate
 suspected fraudulent insurance claims but who does not adjust
 losses or determine claims payments; [or]
 (9)  a public insurance adjuster licensed under Chapter
 4102; or
 (10)  an individual who:
 (A)  collects claim information from, or
 furnishes claim information to, an insured or claimant and enters
 data into an automated claims adjudication system; and
 (B)  is employed by a licensed independent
 adjuster or its affiliate under circumstances in which no more than
 25 individuals performing duties described by Paragraph (A) are
 supervised by a single licensed independent adjuster or a single
 licensed agent.
 (d)  A licensed agent acting as a supervisor under Subsection
 (a)(10) is not required to be licensed as an adjuster.
 SECTION 3.  Section 4101.053, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  To qualify for a license under this chapter, an
 individual [applicant] must:
 (1)  comply with this chapter;
 (2)  present evidence satisfactory to the department
 that the applicant:
 (A)  is at least 18 years of age;
 (B)  resides in this state or a state or country
 that permits a resident of this state to act as an adjuster in that
 state or country;
 (C)  has complied with all federal laws relating
 to employment or the transaction of business in the United States,
 if the applicant does not reside in the United States;
 (D)  is trustworthy; and
 (E)  has had experience, special education, or
 training of sufficient duration and extent regarding the handling
 of loss claims under insurance contracts to make the applicant
 competent to fulfill the responsibilities of an adjuster; and
 (3)  pass an examination conducted under this
 subchapter or present evidence that the applicant has been exempted
 under Section 4101.056.
 (c)  To qualify for a license under this chapter, a business
 entity must:
 (1)  comply with this chapter; and
 (2)  present evidence satisfactory to the department
 that the applicant:
 (A)  is eligible to designate this state as its
 home state;
 (B)  is trustworthy;
 (C)  has designated a licensed adjuster
 responsible for the business entity's compliance with the insurance
 laws of this state;
 (D)  has not committed an act that is a ground for
 probation, suspension, revocation, or refusal of an adjuster's
 license under Section 4101.201; and
 (E)  has paid the fees prescribed under Section
 4101.057.
 (d)  An individual who is a resident of Canada may not be
 licensed under this chapter or designate this state as the
 individual's home state unless the individual has successfully
 passed the adjuster examination and complied with the other
 applicable portions of this section, except that the individual is
 not required to comply with Subsection (a)(2)(B) or (C).
 SECTION 4.  Section 4101.053, Insurance Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an application for a license filed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  A license application filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 applicable to the application immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *