House | 05/09/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3249 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 758 | Journal Page: 3249 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1546 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 746 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 746 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |